Senate | 05/17/2023 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 9. (Effective May 17, 2023) | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | In Senate. To enrollment. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 9.) To Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | Read second time. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | From committee: Do pass. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2023 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2023 | In Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on Second Reading File. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | From committee: Without recommendation. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | From printer. To committee. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |