Senate | 06/12/2023 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 345. (Effective July 1, 2023) | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2023 | In Senate. To enrollment. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2023 | Read second time. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | Taken from Second Reading File. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | Placed on Second Reading File. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | From committee: Do pass. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | In Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | From printer. To committee. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |