Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
Chapter 273. (Effective July 1, 2023)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2023
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2023
|
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2023
|
Read second time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2023
|
Placed on Second Reading File.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2023
|
From committee: Do pass.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2023
|
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2023
|
In Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
To Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
To printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: None, Excused: 3.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Reprinting dispensed with.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 750.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Exemption effective.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Taken from General File.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 47.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Notice of eligibility for exemption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Read first time. To committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
|
|
|