Assembly | 05/20/2023 | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2023 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2023 | In Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read second time. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Placed on Second Reading File. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Read first time. To committee. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |