Assembly | 05/20/2023 | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | In Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 80.) To printer. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Re-referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Read first time. To committee. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |