Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Chapter 228.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Assembly Amendment Nos. 624 and 720 concurred in. To enrollment.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
In Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2023
|
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 720.) To printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2023
|
From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2023
|
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 624.) To printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
In Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 473.) To printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Second Reading File.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Read first time. To committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.
|
|
|