Senate | 06/06/2023 | (No further action taken.) | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Exemption effective. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Read second time. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | From committee: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Read first time. To committee. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer. |