Senate | 04/19/2023 | File No. 13. (Effective April 11, 2023) | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | In Senate. To enrollment. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2023 | Resolution read and adopted. To Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2023 | In Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | To Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Resolution read and adopted. To printer. |