Assembly | 05/20/2023 | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2023 | Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2023 | In Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Resolution read. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | From committee: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | From printer. To committee. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |