Senate | 06/01/2023 | File No. 31. (Effective May 31, 2023) | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | To enrollment. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 536. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | In Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | Resolution read. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | Resolution read. Amended. (Amend. No. 536.) To printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2023 | Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2023 | In Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Resolution read. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | From committee: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | From printer. To committee. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |