Senate | 04/28/2025 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | In Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2025 | To Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2025 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2025 | To printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2025 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2025 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2025 | Dispensed with reprinting. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2025 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 479.) | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2025 | Placed on Second Reading File. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2025 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2025 | From printer. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2025 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |