Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | In Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2025 | To Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2025 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2025 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 12.) | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2025 | To printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2025 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 386.) | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2025 | Placed on Second Reading File. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2025 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2025 | From printer. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2025 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |