Assembly | 04/03/2025 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2025 | Taken from General File. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2025 | Read second time. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2025 | From committee: Do pass. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2025 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2025 | Read first time. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 11/26/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 11/20/2024 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer. |