Senate | 04/23/2025 | Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2025 | In Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2025 | Resolution read. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.) To Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2025 | Placed on Resolution File for next legislative day. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2025 | Taken from Resolution File. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2025 | Placed on Resolution File. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2025 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2025 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2025 | Withdrawn from Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2025 | From printer. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2025 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |