Assembly | 04/24/2025 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2025 | In Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Read second time. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Placed on Second Reading File. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | From committee: Do pass. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | From printer. To committee. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |