Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted by s509b | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.87 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | rules report cal.87 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | print number 28c | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2024 | print number 28b | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2024 | amend and recommit to cities | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to cities | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | print number 28a | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to cities |