Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.7 | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.18 | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2023 | print number 106a | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2023 | amend and recommit to housing | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2023 | referred to housing |