Assembly | 03/21/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.360 | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | print number 109b | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | print number 109a | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | amend and recommit to health | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2023 | referred to health |