Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted by s7050 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.205 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.205 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | print number 124a | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | amend and recommit to local governments | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2023 | referred to local governments |