Assembly | 03/04/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.323 | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2023 | amend and recommit to rules 125b | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | print number 125a | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | amend and recommit to insurance |