LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
A00133
Action History
NY
New York Assembly Bill A00133
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Assembly Bill A00133
Action History
Assembly
05/15/2023
substituted by s2599
Assembly
05/11/2023
advanced to third reading cal.190
Assembly
05/09/2023
reported
Assembly
03/01/2023
reported referred to ways and means
Assembly
01/04/2023
referred to education