Senate | 05/29/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.142 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.142 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | print number 136a | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | amend and recommit to insurance | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to insurance |