LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
A00171
Action History
NY
New York Assembly Bill A00171
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Assembly Bill A00171
Action History
Assembly
01/03/2024
ordered to third reading cal.12
Assembly
04/20/2023
advanced to third reading cal.120
Assembly
04/17/2023
reported
Assembly
01/17/2023
reported referred to codes
Assembly
01/04/2023
referred to health