Assembly | 11/22/2024 | signed chap.458 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.104 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S563 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.14 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.99 | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2023 | referred to housing |