Assembly | 12/22/2023 | approval memo.60 | ||
Assembly | 12/22/2023 | signed chap.734 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.431 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3114A | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.122 | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2023 | print number 266a | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2023 | referred to governmental operations |