Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | print number 284b | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | amend and recommit to higher education | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2024 | print number 284a | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to higher education |