Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.18 | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2023 | amended on third reading 329b | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2023 | amended on third reading (t) 329a | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.88 | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | rules report cal.88 | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2023 | referred to judiciary |