Assembly | 11/22/2024 | signed chap.459 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1770 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8714A | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.298 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.298 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2024 | print number 362a | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to codes | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to codes |