Senate | 06/05/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.226 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.226 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | print number 373b | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to labor | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | print number 373a | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | amend and recommit to labor |