Assembly | 12/22/2023 | approval memo.61 | ||
Assembly | 12/22/2023 | signed chap.735 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1179 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2677A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.483 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | rules report cal.483 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2023 | amend and recommit to rules 463a | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2023 | referred to insurance |