Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted by s6199b | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | amended on third reading 494b | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.361 | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to election law | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | print number 494a | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to election law |