Assembly | 05/06/2024 | amended on third reading 517a | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.21 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | REFERRED TO CODES | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.69 | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2023 | referred to governmental operations |