Assembly | 09/20/2023 | signed chap.482 | ||
Assembly | 09/19/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1618 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S683A | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.156 | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | print number 703a | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2023 | referred to consumer affairs and protection |