Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.677 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1831 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3565A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.227 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.227 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | print number 717a | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |