Assembly | 05/20/2024 | amended on third reading 779c | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.26 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.429 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | rules report cal.429 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | amend and recommit to rules 779b | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | print number 779a | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2023 | referred to consumer affairs and protection |