Senate | 03/26/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.31 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.135 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | rules report cal.135 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2023 | referred to local governments |