Senate | 05/28/2024 | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | amended on third reading 938a | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.364 | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2023 | referred to science and technology |