Assembly | 03/03/2023 | signed chap.25 | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.123 | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1356 | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.34 | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2023 | rules report cal.34 | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2023 | referred to economic development |