Assembly | 03/03/2023 | signed chap.34 | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.101 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1333 | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.10 | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | rules report cal.10 | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2023 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |