Assembly | 03/03/2023 | signed chap.41 | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.110 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1342 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.16 | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | rules report cal.16 | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2023 | referred to health |