Assembly | 11/25/2024 | signed chap.536 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1774 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8880A | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.400 | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | print number 1010b | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | amend and recommit to codes | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2024 | print number 1010a | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to codes | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules |