Assembly | 12/21/2024 | approval memo.45 | ||
Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.603 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1072 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1759B | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.33 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | amended on third reading 1057c | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | recalled from senate | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.21 | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2023 | print number 1057b | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2023 | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2023 | print number 1057a | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2023 | referred to consumer affairs and protection |