Assembly | 05/02/2023 | approval memo.1 | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2023 | signed chap.128 | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.153 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1043A | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.110 | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | rules report cal.110 | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2023 | print number 1060a | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to higher education | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2023 | referred to higher education |