Assembly | 12/21/2024 | approval memo.46 | ||
Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.604 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.491 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1218B | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | RECOMMITTED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2024 | repassed assembly | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | amended on third reading 1080b | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | recalled from senate | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.34 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | amended on third reading 1080a | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.127 | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2023 | referred to governmental operations |