Assembly | 10/01/2024 | signed chap.423 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.633 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1550 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.35 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.9 | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2023 | referred to racing and wagering |