Assembly | 10/25/2023 | signed chap.540 | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.83 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1144A | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | REFERRED TO BANKS | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.23 | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | print number 1153a | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to banks |