Assembly | 11/17/2023 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/17/2023 | vetoed memo.39 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1792 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S288C | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.324 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.324 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | amend and recommit to rules 1191b | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | print number 1191a | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2023 | referred to environmental conservation |