Assembly | 11/22/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/22/2024 | vetoed memo.19 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.798 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2798B | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.228 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.228 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | print number 1231a | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2024 | amend and recommit to insurance |