Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted by s612d | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.229 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.229 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | amend and recommit to rules 1244d | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | print number 1244c | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | amend and recommit to election law | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2024 | print number 1244b | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to election law | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2023 | print number 1244a |