Assembly | 08/04/2023 | delivered to secretary of state | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.150 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S108A | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/19/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.3 | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2023 | to attorney-general for opinion | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2023 | referred to judiciary |